Jelenich, Sandra Elena (CPSO#: 30672)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 2016