Jelinek, Jindrich (CPSO#: 23883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records stored at Record Management 1 High Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3 1.800.775.0093
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 06 Nov 2013


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Aug 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015