Jeloka, Tarun Kumar (CPSO#: 80408)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Patna University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 10 Mar 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005