Jeney, Piroska (CPSO#: 18173)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Mar 1959 to 30 Jun 1960
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1960 to 01 Jul 1961
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012