Jenkin, Peter John (CPSO#: 30653)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2007