Jenkin, Renata Maria (CPSO#: 60665)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: Slapsys, Renata Maria (used until: 07 Jun 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 09 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2000