Jenkins Jr, Donald (CPSO#: 54585)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 643 6th St Courteany BC V9N 1M7
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017