Jenkinson, Richard John (CPSO#: 76066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room MG 321
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6160
Fax: (416) 480-5886
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jenkinson Gien Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gien ( CPSO# 76107 )
Dr. R. Jenkinson ( CPSO# 76066 )

Business Address:
Sunnybook Health Science Centre
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Room MG 321
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6160

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre, T2-104
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4026

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN JENKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006