Jenner, Julie Ann (CPSO#: 67856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C M P A
P O Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: 1 800 267 6522 Ext. 625
Fax: 613 763 1300
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANN JENNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996