Jensen, Christopher Wilson Bassett (CPSO#: 50849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Winnipeg Clinic
425 St Mary Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R3C 0N2
Phone: (204) 957-3306
Fax: (204) 947-0450

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER WILSON BASSETT JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1993