Jensen, Paul (CPSO#: 81938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
3101 Bloor St. West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Phone: (416) 492-6071
Fax: (416) 492-9515
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 55
7600 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Canada
Phone: (289) 371-3500
Fax: (289) 371-3399
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Jensen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jensen ( CPSO# 81938 )

Business Address:
306 - 3101 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 492-6071

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL JENSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JENSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005