Jeong, James (CPSO#: 93572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
General Internal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Canada
Phone: 416-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Jeong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeong ( CPSO# 93572 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES JEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014