Jericho, Monique Carla (CPSO#: 77549)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 01 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Mar 2006
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2006