Jerome, Dana Cecelia (CPSO#: 67867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6344
Fax: (416) 323-6115
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 07 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA CECELIA JEROME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEROME is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2000