Jerzak, Katarzyna Joanna (CPSO#: 90592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATARZYNA JOANNA JERZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JERZAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014