Jessamine, Peter Gordon (CPSO#: 54603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital -General Campus
Division Of Microbiology
Box 115
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79138
Fax: (613) 737-8557
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GORDON JESSAMINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JESSAMINE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1990