Jessamy, Nalya Taneisha (CPSO#: 82412)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: (416) 461-2710
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.T. Jessamy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jessamy ( CPSO# 82412 )

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NALYA TANEISHA JESSAMY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JESSAMY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007