Jethalal, Hirendrarai Dharamshee (CPSO#: 27162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 May 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Natal, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone: (416) 289-3221
Fax: (416) 289-3181
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mississauga Clinic
Suite 111
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: (905) 897-9228
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Whitby Specialist Clinic
Suite 302
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 666-2222
Fax: (905) 668-6655
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Jethalal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jethalal ( CPSO# 27162 )

Business Address:
Suite 316
1200 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 289-3221

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 May 2001

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 May 2001 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 10, 2001, Dr. Hirendrarai D. Jethalal undertakes to not apply for
            privileges at any hospital in Ontario until after he has given at least two
            months notice to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario of his
            intention to apply for privileges.