Jetly, Rakesh (CPSO#: 64129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C F Health Services GP HQ
101 Colonel By Drive
Carling Campus, Building 9
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 901 9676
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1454 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Jetly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jetly ( CPSO# 64129 )

Business Address:
103 - 1454 Dundas Street East
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Phone Number: (613) 410-2982

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAKESH JETLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992