Jetty, Prasad (CPSO#: 71462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Telugu

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A 280
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jetty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jetty ( CPSO# 77465 )
Dr. P. Jetty ( CPSO# 71462 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5555

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
P.O. Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRASAD JETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JETTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2004