Jeun, Bing Wann (CPSO#: 18114)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please direct any inquiries regarding requests for medical records to: P.O Box 32008 7980 Menard Street Windsor ON N8S 4T8
Date Received: 30 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2013