Jevon, Gareth Peter (CPSO#: 58077)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2002