Jewell, Kirsten Elizabeth (CPSO#: 101775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville District Memorial Hospit
Emergency Department
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-0022
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jewell and McClure Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jewell ( CPSO# 101775)
Dr. A. McClure ( CPSO# 101758)

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ELIZABETH JEWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2015