Jewett, Michael Alexander Spencer (CPSO#: 22988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Mar 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 Univesity Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2909 Ext. 3
Fax: (416) 946-6590
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jewett Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jewett ( CPSO# 22988 )
Dr. B. Gallie ( CPSO# 28022 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
3-130 - 610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2909

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER SPENCER JEWETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEWETT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1976