Jeyaranjan, Atputhanathan Richard (CPSO#: 66131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1585 Markham Road
Suite 302
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone: (416) 222-8004
Fax: (416) 332-9359
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Jeyaranjan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jeyaranjan ( CPSO# 66131 )

Business Address:
302 - 1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-8000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ATPUTHANATHAN RICHARD JEYARANJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEYARANJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1994