Jezdic, Dusanka Donna (CPSO#: 65273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian, Yugoslav

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Manning Road
Suite 4
Tecumseh ON  N8N 5H3
Phone: 519-979-2235
Fax: (519) 979-4890
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3920 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Canada
Phone: (519) 946-0123
Fax: (519) 946-0125
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dusanka Jezdic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jezdic ( CPSO# 65273 )

Business Address:
Lakeshore Health Centre
330 Notre Dame
Belle River ON  N0R 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 728-0777

Business Address:
500 Manning Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4Z4
Phone Number: (519) 979-2235

Business Address:
3920 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 946-0123

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUSANKA DONNA JEZDIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEZDIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993