Jha, Prabhat Kiran Shekhar (CPSO#: 60330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6042 Ext. 77550
Fax: (416) 864-5256
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prabhat Jha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jha ( CPSO# 60330 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite LK-684
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6042

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PRABHAT KIRAN SHEKHAR JHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1989