Jha, Reena Chetna (CPSO#: 69834)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 2000