Jhas, Sumitpal Singh (CPSO#: 90710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Neurological Associates
101 Queensway West, Suite 134
Toronto ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 279-3533
Fax: (905) 615-0492
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jhas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jhas ( CPSO# 90710 )

Business Address:
Trillium Neurological Associates
134 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 279-3533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMITPAL SINGH JHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015