Jhawar, Balraj Singh (CPSO#: 68237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Neurosurgical Consultants
Suite 205
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: (519) 973-4690
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balraj Jhawar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2017


Corporation Name: Balraj Jhawar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jhawar ( CPSO# 68237 )

Business Address:
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Suite 205
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-3771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALRAJ SINGH JHAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHAWAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004