Jhirad, Reuven Ray (CPSO#: 62546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Chief Coroner and
Ontario Forensic Pathology Service
Forensic Serives & Coroners Complex
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1830
Fax: (416) 314-4030
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REUVEN RAY JHIRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHIRAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 28 Feb 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991