Jiang, Chaozhe (CPSO#: 71039)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Zhejiang Medical University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Ext. 1212
Fax: (905) 336-6483
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liu Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Liu ( CPSO# 72962 )
Dr. C. Jiang ( CPSO# 71039 )

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 338-4140

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
1745 Heritage Way
Oakville ON  L6M 3A2
Phone Number: (905) 469-9638

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHAOZHE JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998