Jiang, Nianxin (CPSO#: 100879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive E
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone: (905) 884-0666
Fax: (905) 884-5317
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pharmalinx Medical Centre
2101 Brimley Road, Scarborough, ON
Scarborough ON  M1S 2B4
Canada
Phone: 416-297-7400
Fax: 416-293-5100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Jiang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jiang ( CPSO# 100879)

Business Address:
All About Health
Unit E
1070 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 884-0666

Business Address:
2101 Brimley Road
Scarborough ON  M1S 2B4
Phone Number: (416) 297-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIANXIN JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015