Jiaravuthisan, Michael Manussavee (CPSO#: 83273)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8 and 9
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 336-9624
Fax: (905) 336-9625
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Somchai Jiaravuthisan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2017


Corporation Name: Michael Jiaravuthisan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jiaravuthisan ( CPSO# 83273 )

Business Address:
Suite 8 & 9
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 336-9624

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL MANUSSAVEE JIARAVUTHISAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIARAVUTHISAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)