Jiaravuthisan, Somchai (CPSO#: 33107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Thai

Education:Mahidol University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Somchai Jiaravuthisan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Glazier Medical Centre 11 Gib Street Oshawa ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 10 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Nov 2016
Summary:

On November 7, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that that Dr. Somchai Jiaravuthisan has committed an act of professional 
misconduct in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable, or unprofessional and in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
the profession. 
 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan, a neurologist practising in Ontario since 1982, attended medical school at 
Mahidol University in Thailand and worked at the Glazier Medical Centre in Oshawa. 
 
PATIENT A 
 
Patient A had a single office appointment with Dr. Jiaravuthisan in May 2009. She was referred 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan for pain in her hand, hyperemia in both hands, and positive Tinel’s sign.  
 
When Dr. Jiaravuthisan took a history from Patient A, she experienced his questions as abrupt 
and his manner as directive. Dr. Jiaravuthisan commenced and documented an examination of 
Patient A. He examined her gait, took her vital signs, and examined her cardiovascular and 
respiratory systems.  
 
Although Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s examination of Patient A was medically indicated, he failed to 
explain the steps of his examination or to seek Patient A’s informed consent to the examination 
which he was conducting.  
 
As part of his physical examination, Dr. Jiaravuthisan began to palpate Patient A’s abdomen 
while she lay on an examination table. As he did so, he moved his hands below the waist band of 
her trousers to the suprapubic area below her navel, again without explanation or seeking 
informed consent. In doing so, Dr. Jiaravuthisan failed to show sensitivity and respect for Patient 
A’s comfort, which was unprofessional.  
 
Patient A was confused and upset by Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s actions and did not know why he had 
moved his hands below the waist band of her trousers. She sat up and demanded to know what 
he was doing, then left the examination room and complained to his office staff about his 
behaviour.  
 
PATIENT B 
 
Patient B attended the single office appointment she had with Dr. Jiaravuthisan in October 2013 
with a friend, who was also present in the examination room. Patient B’s family physician 
referred her to see Dr. Jiaravuthisan because of leg pain, weakness, and tingling. 
 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan took a history from Patient B. Dr. Jiaravuthisan also conducted and 
documented an examination of Patient B, including a neurological examination, motor system 
examination, and physical examination.  
 


 
 

Although Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s examination of Patient B was medically indicated, he failed to 
explain the steps of his examination or to seek Patient B’s informed consent to the examination 
which he was conducting.  
 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan failed to offer Patient B appropriate draping or a gown, or to wear a glove or 
gloves while examining her. He also displaced her clothing himself by putting his hand under her 
pants, by rolling up one of her pant legs himself, and by pulling her shirt.  
 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan did not take sufficient care to maintain spatial boundaries with Patient B while 
examining her. While he was palpating Patient B’s abdomen with one hand, without warning, 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan placed his other hand below her underpants on her mons pubis (external genital 
area) for approximately thirty seconds. Dr. Jiaravuthisan advises that any such contact would 
have been inadvertent, as he intended only to palpate Patient B’s suprapubic area.  
 
Dr. Jiaravuthisan then directed Patient B to roll over to examine her tailbone area where she said 
that she had been experiencing pain. Dr. Jiaravuthisan palpated Patient B’s tailbone area 
underneath her clothing. In the course of doing so, he touched Patient B’s buttocks in what felt to 
her like a squeezing motion. In examining Patient B’s face, Dr. Jiaravuthisan also touched her 
face in a manner that felt to her like grabbing.  
 
Because Dr. Jiaravuthisan did not show sensitivity and respect for Patient B’s comfort by 
maintaining spatial boundaries, communicating appropriately regarding the examination, and 
offering draping, the appointment was very distressing to Patient B. Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s conduct 
in this regard was unprofessional.  
 
Afterwards, Patient B told office staff in tears that she did not like how Dr. Jiaravuthisan had 
touched her and did not want to return, and she expressed her concerns to her family physician. 
 
On October 19, 2016, Dr. Jiaravuthisan entered into an undertaking with the College agreeing to 
resign his certificate of registration effective November 7, 2016, and not to reapply for a 
certificate in future. 
 
PENALTY 
 
On November 7, 2016, in light of Dr. Jiaravuthisan’s undertaking to resign his certificate of 
registration and not to reapply, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
   -  Dr. Jiaravuthisan appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
   -  Dr. Jiaravuthisan pay to the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of 
      $5,000.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Nov 7 , 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Somchai Jiaravuthisan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 7, 2016:

Dr. Jiaravuthisan was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Jiaravuthisan resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)