Jibri, Zaid Adil (CPSO#: 104955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 2014

Expiry Date:  18 Sep 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 19 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
L2121 CPCR Building Box 232
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital- Civic Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 17150
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital-
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 82262
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zaid Jibri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jibri ( CPSO# 104955)

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
L2121 CPCR Building Box 232
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 19 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Sep 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Zaid Adil Jibri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,  at  the  University of Ottawa, in which Dr.
                        Jibri  holds  an academic appointment  at  the  rank  of  Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Jibri no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that Dr. Jibri's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional  conduct,  or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an  annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr.  Jibri's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on September 19, 2014.  In accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 18, 2021.