Jichici, Draga (CPSO#: 60644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street
Suite 204A
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 821-4421
Fax: (519) 821-3341
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (519) 527-0271 Ext. 46330
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jichici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jichici ( CPSO# 60644 )

Business Address:
Norfolk Medical Centre
204A - 85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 821-9861

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGA JICHICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JICHICI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990