Jilkina, Tatiana Alexandrovna (CPSO#: 87871)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Spanish

Education:Astrakhan State Medical Academy, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-3675
Fax: (613) 732-9986
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3044
Fax: (613) 756-0106
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place
Ontario
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
Fax: (613) 257-3026
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Jilkina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jilkina ( CPSO# 87871 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-3675

Business Address:
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
2120B Highway 51
PO Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TATIANA ALEXANDROVNA JILKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JILKINA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010