Jimenez, Carmencita Lara (CPSO#: 33064)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1982
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2011

Concerns

Source: Fitness to Practice Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective July 12, 2011, Dr. Jimenez has resigned from the College.