Jimenez Juan, Laura (CPSO#: 87503)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2012

Expiry Date:  12 Apr 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:Universidad Miguel Hernandez, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 85389
Fax: (416) 480-6033
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christakis Arenson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Berger ( CPSO# 110670)
Dr. C. Patel ( CPSO# 96861 )
Dr. M. Machnowska ( CPSO# 92153 )
Dr. R. Wolfson ( CPSO# 86607 )
Dr. N. Curpen ( CPSO# 78380 )
Dr. M. Christakis ( CPSO# 62099 )
Dr. C. Betel ( CPSO# 73485 )
Dr. R. Aviv ( CPSO# 78068 )
Dr. A. Arenson ( CPSO# 32995 )
Dr. E. David ( CPSO# 71504 )
Dr. P. Glanc ( CPSO# 55972 )
Dr. K. Hack ( CPSO# 81145 )
Dr. P. Howard ( CPSO# 74992 )
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 23271 )
Dr. E. Martinovic ( CPSO# 76031 )
Dr. A. Moody ( CPSO# 63017 )
Dr. J. Rubenstein ( CPSO# 29908 )
Dr. C. Dey ( CPSO# 94397 )
Dr. P. Jabehdar Maralani ( CPSO# 84825 )
Dr. P. Hamilton ( CPSO# 55254 )
Dr. C. McGregor ( CPSO# 70337 )
Dr. A. Oikonomou ( CPSO# 76829 )
Dr. R. Pugash ( CPSO# 53910 )
Dr. L. Probyn ( CPSO# 73373 )
Dr. L. Richmond ( CPSO# 81154 )
Dr. J. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 66362 )
Dr. S. Symons ( CPSO# 69225 )
Dr. J. Wall ( CPSO# 57057 )
Dr. R. Yeung ( CPSO# 83681 )
Dr. M. Skarpathiotakis ( CPSO# 84703 )
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )
Dr. H. Ghandehari ( CPSO# 84625 )
Dr. L. Jimenez Juan ( CPSO# 87503 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room MG100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5862

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 13 Apr 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 02 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 03 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 13 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Feb 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Laura Jimenez Juan may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Jimenez Juan holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Jimenez Juan  no  longer  holds  the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating  that  Dr.  Jimenez Juan's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a decision about  Dr.  Jimenez  Juan's
                        certificate  of  registration,  following   consideration   of  the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  13,  2012.   In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not  extended  by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on April 12, 2019.