Jin, Eddy Yong Hyun (CPSO#: 78890)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6882
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eddy Y. H. Jin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin ( CPSO# 78890 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000


Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Y. Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 92883 )
Dr. E. Jin ( CPSO# 78890 )

Business Address:
5080 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDDY YONG HYUN JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2003