Jin, Jing (CPSO#: 86190)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
103A - 801 York Mills Rd
North York ON  M3B 1X7
Phone: 4164798377
Fax: 4164798688
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JING JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2018