Jin, Sherry Yi (CPSO#: 111380)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2017 to 05 Mar 2017
Elective Trainee - Transfusion Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Apr 2018 to 06 May 2018
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2017