Jindal, Kailash Kumar (CPSO#: 54591)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Kashmir University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002