Jinnah, Rashid Ahmed (CPSO#: 63992)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone: (905) 848-4362
Fax: (905) 848-6929
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.A. Jinnah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jinnah ( CPSO# 63992 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1645 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L5C 1E3
Phone Number: (905) 848-4362

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RASHID AHMED JINNAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINNAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992