Jirsch, Dennis William (CPSO#: 27585)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1991