Jirsch, Jacqueline Edith (CPSO#: 26111)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 2010