Jo, Woo Je (CPSO#: 73428)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 14 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007