Joannou, Jason Alexander Joseph (CPSO#: 84926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH-College Site
250 College St. Rm 534-B
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 36260
Fax: (416) 260-4216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sian R. Rawkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joannou ( CPSO# 84926 )
Dr. S. Rawkins ( CPSO# 76097 )

Business Address:
CAMH-College Site
250 College St.
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 932
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Corporation Name: Jason A. Joannou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Joannou ( CPSO# 84926 )
Dr. S. Rawkins ( CPSO# 76097 )

Business Address:
CAMH-College Site
250 College St. Rm 534-B
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ALEXANDER JOSEPH JOANNOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOANNOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011