Joaquin, Andrew Josaphat (CPSO#: 27789)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 2001